Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 30, 2021