Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1628 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021