Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1642 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1642


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of navigation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 60, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 60.0726 to read as follows:
 Sec. 60.0726.  FIRES, EXPLOSIONS, AND HAZARDOUS MATERIALS
 INCIDENTS. A district may respond to and fight a fire, explosion,
 or hazardous material incident that occurs on or adjacent to a
 waterway, channel, or turning basin that is located in the
 district's territory, regardless of whether the waterway, channel,
 or turning basin is located in the corporate limits of a
 municipality.
 SECTION 2.  Section 60.101, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (a-1) and (e) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  A district may acquire, purchase, lease, maintain,
 repair, and operate facilities and equipment for the purposes of
 protecting life and property by detecting, responding to, and
 fighting fires, explosions, and hazardous materials incidents
 described by Section 60.0726.
 (d)  A district may contract with a broker to sell or lease a
 tract of land in the same manner as the commissioners court of a
 county under Section 263.008, Local Government Code.
 (e)  A lease that requires the lessee to construct
 improvements on land owned by the district is not a public work
 contract for purposes of Chapter 2253, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 60.103, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 60.103.  PRESCRIBING FEES AND CHARGES.  The district
 [commission] shall prescribe fees and charges to be collected for
 the use of the land, improvements, and facilities of the district
 and for the use of any land, improvements, or facilities acquired
 under the provisions of this subchapter. The fees and charges shall
 be reasonable, equitable, and sufficient to produce revenue
 necessary to exercise the powers described by Section 60.101 and
 adequate to pay the expenses described by [mentioned in] Section
 60.105 [of this code].
 SECTION 4.  Sections 60.172(b), (c), and (d), Water Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The commission shall fix a time and place at which a
 public hearing concerning the proposed indebtedness shall be held.
 The date of the hearing shall be not less than seven [15] days nor
 more than 30 days from the date of the resolution of the commission
 giving [the] notice of the hearing date.
 (c)  Notice published by the commission under this section
 shall:
 (1)  include a statement of the amount and purpose of
 the proposed indebtedness;
 (2)  inform all persons of the time and place of
 hearing; and
 (3)  inform all persons of their right to express their
 views [appear] at the hearing, orally or in writing, and contend for
 or protest the creation of the indebtedness.
 (d)  The secretary of the commission shall publish [post
 copies of] the notice not earlier than the seventh day [for 10 days]
 before the date [day] of the hearing:
 (1)  once in a newspaper of general circulation in the
 district's territory that is available to residents of the
 district; and
 (2)  on the district's Internet website, if the
 district maintains a website, in an area of that website used to
 inform district residents about events such as public meetings
 [three public places in the district and at the door of each county
 courthouse located in the district].
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 60.405, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 60.405.  PROPOSAL PROCEDURES [COMPETITIVE SEALED
 PROPOSALS].
 SECTION 6.  Section 60.405, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Items that may be purchased under the procedure
 provided by this section include items required in connection with
 a navigation project entered into with the United States.
 SECTION 7.  Section 60.463(d-1), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d-1)  If a two-step process is used, the district may not
 request prices in the first step. In the second step, the district
 may request that [five or fewer] offerors, selected solely on the
 basis of qualifications, provide additional information, including
 proposed prices.
 SECTION 8.  Subchapter Q, Chapter 60, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 60.502 to read as follows:
 Sec. 60.502.  IMPLIED CONTRACTS. A schedule of rates, fees,
 charges, rules, and ordinances that have been adopted in accordance
 with applicable law or the district's rules, including a limitation
 of liability for cargo loss or damage, that relates to receiving,
 delivering, handling, or storing property at a district facility
 and that is made available to the public on the district's Internet
 website is enforceable by an appropriate court as an implied
 contract between the district and a person using the district's
 facilities without proof of actual knowledge of the schedule's
 provisions.
 SECTION 9.  Sections 62.123(b) and (d), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  No franchise shall be granted for longer than 50 years
 nor shall a franchise be granted except on the affirmative vote of a
 majority of the commissioners present at a meeting [three separate
 meetings] of the commission [which meetings may not be closer
 together than one week].
 (d)  The franchise shall require the grantee to file the
 grantee's written acceptance of the franchise within 30 days after
 the franchise is granted [finally approved] by the commission.
 SECTION 10.  Section 60.172(e), Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1642 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1642 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 9, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor