Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1649 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/23/2021

                            By: Perry S.B. No. 1649
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 23, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to receive
 certain tax revenue derived from certain establishments related to
 a hotel and convention center project and to pledge certain tax
 revenue for the payment of obligations related to the project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 351.157(b), (c), and (e), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(3);
 (2)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(6);
 (3)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(7);
 (4)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(10);
 (4-a)  a municipality described by Section
 351.152(14);
 (5)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(16);
 (6)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(22);
 (7)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(25);
 (8)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(34);
 (9)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(35);
 (10)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(36);
 and
 (11)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(38).
 (c)  A municipality is entitled to receive revenue under
 Subsection (d) derived from the following types of establishments
 that meet the requirements of Subsections (a)(1), (2), (3), and
 (4):
 (1)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(1):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (2)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(2),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (3)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(3),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (4)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(4):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (4-a)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(4-a):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (5)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(5),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (6)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(6),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (7)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(7),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (8)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(8),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (9)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(9),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (10)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(10):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel; and
 (11)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(11):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel.
 (e)  A municipality to which this section applies is not
 entitled to receive revenue under Subsection (d) unless the
 municipality commences a qualified project under this subchapter
 before September 1, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *