Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021