Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1677 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1677
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1677 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eliminating certain reporting and posting requirements
 for public institutions of higher education and other state
 agencies and the requirement for a plan by certain school districts
 to increase enrollment in public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.402(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The governing board of each institution of higher
 education in the state shall adopt rules and regulations concerning
 faculty academic workloads. In adopting rules under this
 subsection, each institution shall recognize that classroom
 teaching, basic and applied research, and professional development
 are important elements of faculty academic workloads by giving
 appropriate weight to each activity when determining the standards
 for faculty academic workload. An institution may give the same or
 different weight to each activity and to other activities
 recognized by the institution as important elements of faculty
 academic workloads. [The established rules and regulations of each
 institution shall be included in the operating budgets of each
 institution.]
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0341 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0341.  LIMITATION ON DATA COLLECTION AND REPORTING
 REQUIREMENTS. (a)  The legislature finds that data collection and
 reporting requirements for institutions of higher education must be
 limited and reduced to the extent feasible.
 (b)  If the commissioner of higher education determines that
 the board has access to an alternative means of collecting data or
 receiving information to be included in a report sufficient to
 fulfill a requirement under this code, the board by rule may
 eliminate the reporting requirement for that data or information.
 SECTION 3.  Section 659.0201(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A state agency that accepts a gift, grant, donation, or
 other consideration from a person that the person designates to be
 used as a salary supplement for an employee of the agency shall post
 on the agency's Internet website[, in addition to the information
 required by Section 659.026,] the amount of each gift, grant,
 donation, or other consideration provided by the person that is
 designated to be used as a salary supplement for an employee of the
 agency. The agency may not post the name of the person.
 SECTION 4.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 29.904 and 51.4031, Education Code; and
 (2)  Section 659.026, Government Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *