Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021