Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021