Senate | 04/22/2021 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Postponed 4/20/2021 2:30 PM | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |