Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021