Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1728 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Schwertner, Nichols, Powell S.B. No. 1728
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1728 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the equalization for road use consumption for
 alternatively fueled vehicles imposed at the time of registration
 or registration renewal; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.198(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Sections 502.058, 502.060,
 502.1911, 502.192, 502.356, [and] 502.357, and 502.360 and
 Subchapter H, this section applies to all fees collected by a county
 assessor-collector under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.360 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.360.  EQUALIZATION FOR ROAD USE CONSUMPTION FOR
 ALTERNATIVELY FUELED VEHICLES. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Alternatively fueled vehicle" means a motor
 vehicle that is capable of being powered by a source other than
 gasoline or diesel fuel.
 (2)  "Conventionally fueled vehicle" means a motor
 vehicle that is capable of being powered only by gasoline or diesel
 fuel.
 (3)  "Hybrid electric vehicle" means a motor vehicle,
 including a plug-in hybrid electric motor vehicle, that is capable
 of being powered by both electricity and gasoline, diesel, or
 another type of fuel.
 (4)  "Natural gas vehicle" means a motor vehicle that
 is capable of being powered only by compressed natural gas or
 liquefied natural gas as fuel.
 (b)  In addition to other fees authorized under this chapter,
 at the time of application for registration or renewal of
 registration of an alternatively fueled vehicle, other than a
 vehicle subject to a fee under Subsection (c) or (d), the applicant
 shall pay an additional fee according to the gross weight of the
 vehicle, as follows:
 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule  Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule
 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule
 0-6,000 $200  0-6,000 $200
 0-6,000 $200
 6,001-10,000 $250  6,001-10,000 $250
 6,001-10,000 $250
 (c)  In addition to other fees authorized under this chapter,
 at the time of application for registration or renewal of
 registration of a hybrid electric vehicle, the applicant shall pay
 an additional fee according to the gross weight of the vehicle, as
 follows:
 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule  Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule
 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule
 0-6,000 $40  0-6,000 $40
 0-6,000 $40
 6,001-10,000 $50  6,001-10,000 $50
 6,001-10,000 $50
 (d)  In addition to other fees authorized under this chapter,
 at the time of application for registration or renewal of
 registration of a natural gas vehicle, the applicant shall pay an
 additional fee in an amount equal to the difference between the
 amounts calculated under Subsections (e)(1) and (2) for that class
 of vehicle.
 (e)  The department shall, for each class of natural gas
 vehicle, calculate:
 (1)  the average annual amount of taxes imposed under
 Chapter 162, Tax Code, that a conventionally fueled vehicle of that
 class would pay; and
 (2)  the average annual amount of taxes imposed under
 that chapter that a natural gas vehicle of that class would pay.
 (f)  The department shall review and update the fee
 calculated under Subsection (e) at least once every five years.
 (g)  Fees collected under this section shall be deposited to
 the credit of the state highway fund.
 (h)  The board shall adopt rules necessary to administer this
 section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *

 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule

 0-6,000 $200

 6,001-10,000 $250

 Weight Classification in pounds Fee Schedule

 0-6,000 $40

 6,001-10,000 $50