Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1728 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021