Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB173 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2020

                            87R1084 SRA-D
 By: Miles S.B. No. 173


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the African American Family Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 401, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 401.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.106.  AFRICAN AMERICAN FAMILY COMMISSION. (a) In
 this section, "commission" means the African American Family
 Commission established under this section.
 (b)  The governor shall establish the African American
 Family Commission in the office of the governor to improve and
 expand existing policies, services, programs, and opportunities
 for African American families.
 (c)  The commission shall:
 (1)  guide the efforts of and collaborate with state
 agencies and the office of the governor in matters relating to
 African American families;
 (2)  monitor and comment on existing and proposed
 legislation and programs designed to address the needs of African
 Americans in this state;
 (3)  assist state agencies in developing programs,
 services, public policies, and research strategies that will expand
 and enhance the social and economic well-being of African American
 children and families;
 (4)  facilitate the participation and representation
 of African Americans in the development, implementation, and
 planning of policies, programs, and services; and
 (5)  promote research efforts to document the impact of
 policies and programs on African American families.
 (d)  The commission is composed of seven members appointed by
 the governor. The governor shall appoint members that reflect the
 various regions of the state to ensure that the needs of African
 American families and children throughout this state are
 represented. Members serve staggered three-year terms, with the
 terms of two or three members, as appropriate, expiring each year.
 (e)  The commission shall annually report on the
 commission's progress toward the objectives described by
 Subsection (c) to the governor and the members of the legislature.
 (f)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts, donations,
 and grants of money from any public or private source to assist the
 commission in fulfilling its duties under this section.
 SECTION 2.  In making the initial appointments to the
 commission established under this Act, the governor shall appoint:
 (1)  two members to terms expiring February 1, 2022;
 (2)  two members to terms expiring February 1, 2023;
 and
 (3)  three members to terms expiring February 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.