Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1758 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2021

                            87R9014 MEW-D
 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1758


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reenrollment of certain retirees in the Texas Public
 School Employees Group Insurance Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1575.161, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b) and (c) to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the trustee by rule
 shall provide one opportunity to reenroll in a health benefit plan
 offered under the group program for an otherwise eligible retiree:
 (1)  whose initial enrollment was voluntarily
 terminated on or after September 1, 2017, and on or before September
 1, 2018; and
 (2)  who opts to reenroll on or before November 1, 2022.
 (c)  Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1,
 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than November 1, 2021, the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 1575.161(b), Insurance Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.