House
|
05/31/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Record vote RV#987
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Amended 3-M. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Amended 2-Collier
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Amended 1-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 7-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 6-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 5-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 4-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 3-Vasut
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 2-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 1-K. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1776
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|