Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1780 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021