Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021