Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021