Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021