Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1814 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021