Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1818 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021