|
06/18/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1740
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1409
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended 1-Parker
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Postponed 5/24/21 11:30 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 2-Burns
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 1-Parker, Davis, Meyer, Shaheen, Hunter, A. Johnson, Ordaz Perez, Goldman, Sherman, and M. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|