Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021