Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1860 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                    By: Powell S.B. No. 1860
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating an electronic application system for state
 student financial assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2, Chapter 801 (H.B. 2140), Acts of the
 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply beginning
 with applications for state student financial assistance submitted
 for the 2023-2024 [2022-2023] academic year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *