Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1860 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021