Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1911 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1911
1+By: Blanco, et al. S.B. No. 1911
2+ (Rose)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the content of an application for Medicaid.
68 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
79 SECTION 1. Section 32.025, Human Resources Code, is amended
810 by amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (h) to read as
911 follows:
1012 (g) The application form, including a renewal form, adopted
1113 under this section must include:
1214 (1) for an applicant who is pregnant, a question
1315 regarding whether the pregnancy is the woman's first gestational
1416 pregnancy; [and]
1517 (2) for all applicants, a question regarding the
16- applicant's preferences for being contacted by a managed care
17- organization or health plan provider that provides the applicant
18- with the option to be contacted[, as follows:
18+ applicant's preferences for being contacted that provides the
19+ applicant with the option to be contacted[, as follows:
1920 ["If you are determined eligible for benefits,
2021 your managed care organization or health plan provider may contact
2122 you] by telephone, text message, or e-mail about health care
2223 matters, including reminders for appointments and information
2324 about immunizations or well check visits; and
2425 (3) language that:
2526 (A) notifies the applicant that, if determined
2627 eligible for benefits, all preferred contact methods listed on the
2728 application and renewal forms will be shared with the applicant's
2829 managed care organization or health plan provider;
2930 (B) allows the applicant to consent to being
3031 contacted through the preferred contact methods by the applicant's
3132 managed care organization or health plan provider; and
3233 (C) explains the security risks of electronic
3334 communication. [All preferred methods of contact listed on this
3435 application will be shared with your managed care organization or
3536 health plan provider. Please indicate below your preferred methods
3637 of contact in order of preference, with the number 1 being the most
3738 preferable method:
3839 [(1) By telephone (if contacted by cellular telephone,
3940 the call may be autodialed or prerecorded, and your carrier's usage
4041 rates may apply)? Yes No
4142 [Telephone number: _____________
4243 [Order of preference: 1 2 3 (circle a number)
4344 [(2) By text message (a free autodialed service, but
4445 your carrier may charge message and data rates)? Yes No
4546 [Cellular telephone number: ______________
4647 [Order of preference: 1 2 3 (circle a number)
4748 [(3) By e-mail? Yes No
4849 [E-mail address: __________________
4950 [Order of preference: 1 2 3 (circle a number)".]
5051 (h) For purposes of Subsections (g)(2) and (3), the
5152 commission shall implement a process to:
5253 (1) transmit the applicant's preferred contact methods
5354 and consent to the managed care organization or health plan
5455 provider;
5556 (2) allow an applicant to change the applicant's
5657 preferences in the future, including providing for an option to opt
5758 out of electronic communication; and
5859 (3) communicate updated information to the managed
5960 care organization or health plan provider.
6061 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2022, the executive
6162 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
6263 adopt a revised application form for medical assistance benefits
6364 that conforms to the requirements of Section 32.025(g), Human
6465 Resources Code, as amended by this Act.
6566 SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act
6667 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
6768 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
6869 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
6970 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
7071 waiver or authorization is granted.
7172 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7273 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7374 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7475 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7576 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
76- ______________________________ ______________________________
77- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
78- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1911 passed the Senate on
79- April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
80- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
81- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
82- ______________________________
83- Secretary of the Senate
84- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1911 passed the House, with
85- amendment, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
86- Nays 0, one present not voting.
87- ______________________________
88- Chief Clerk of the House
89- Approved:
90- ______________________________
91- Date
92- ______________________________
93- Governor