Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 24, 2021