Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021