Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021