13 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 51.4033, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | | - | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read |
---|
15 | | - | as follows: |
---|
16 | | - | (a) Not later than August [March] 1 of each year and in the |
---|
17 | | - | form prescribed by the coordinating board, each general academic |
---|
18 | | - | teaching institution shall provide to the coordinating board and |
---|
19 | | - | the legislature a report describing any courses in the |
---|
20 | | - | Lower-Division Academic Course Guide Manual or its successor |
---|
21 | | - | adopted by the coordinating board for which a student who transfers |
---|
22 | | - | to the institution from another institution of higher education is |
---|
23 | | - | not granted: |
---|
24 | | - | (1) academic credit at the receiving institution; or |
---|
25 | | - | (2) if the student has declared a major and has not |
---|
26 | | - | changed majors, academic credit toward the student's major at the |
---|
27 | | - | receiving institution. |
---|
28 | | - | (c) Each general academic teaching institution shall |
---|
29 | | - | annually post on the institution's Internet website a |
---|
30 | | - | transferability report card using the data reported under this |
---|
31 | | - | section. The report card must: |
---|
32 | | - | (1) be designed to provide information to students in |
---|
33 | | - | a concise manner; and |
---|
34 | | - | (2) include a summary of the data reported under this |
---|
35 | | - | section. |
---|
36 | | - | (d) The coordinating board shall: |
---|
37 | | - | (1) in consultation with general academic teaching |
---|
38 | | - | institutions, develop a model transferability report card for use |
---|
39 | | - | under Subsection (c); and |
---|
40 | | - | (2) post on the coordinating board's Internet website |
---|
41 | | - | each general academic teaching institution's transferability |
---|
42 | | - | report card posted on the institution's Internet website under |
---|
43 | | - | Subsection (c). |
---|
44 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 51.4034, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
45 | | - | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read |
---|
46 | | - | as follows: |
---|
47 | | - | (a) Not later than August [March] 1 of each year and in the |
---|
48 | | - | form prescribed by the coordinating board, each public junior |
---|
49 | | - | college shall provide to the coordinating board and the legislature |
---|
50 | | - | a report on courses taken by students who, during the preceding |
---|
51 | | - | academic year, transferred to a general academic teaching |
---|
52 | | - | institution or earned an associate degree at the college. |
---|
53 | | - | (c) Each public junior college shall annually post on the |
---|
54 | | - | college's Internet website a transferability report card using the |
---|
55 | | - | data reported under this section. The report card must: |
---|
56 | | - | (1) be designed to provide information to students in |
---|
57 | | - | a concise manner; and |
---|
58 | | - | (2) include a summary of the data reported under this |
---|
59 | | - | section, including the percentage of courses attempted that were |
---|
60 | | - | also completed at the college, disaggregated by each category |
---|
61 | | - | described by Subsection (b). |
---|
62 | | - | (d) The coordinating board shall: |
---|
63 | | - | (1) in consultation with public junior colleges, |
---|
64 | | - | develop a model transferability report card for use under |
---|
65 | | - | Subsection (c); and |
---|
66 | | - | (2) post on the coordinating board's Internet website |
---|
67 | | - | each public junior college's transferability report card posted on |
---|
68 | | - | the college's Internet website under Subsection (c). |
---|
69 | | - | SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
| 9 | + | SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is |
---|
| 10 | + | amended by adding Section 51.96854 to read as follows: |
---|
| 11 | + | Sec. 51.96854. TRANSFERABILITY REPORT CARD. (a) In this |
---|
| 12 | + | section: |
---|
| 13 | + | (1) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher |
---|
| 14 | + | Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
| 15 | + | (2) "General academic teaching institution" and |
---|
| 16 | + | "public state college" have the meanings assigned by Section |
---|
| 17 | + | 61.003. |
---|
| 18 | + | (b) Not later than March 1 of each year, a general academic |
---|
| 19 | + | teaching institution other than a public state college shall post |
---|
| 20 | + | on the institution's Internet website a transferability report card |
---|
| 21 | + | that indicates for the preceding academic year: |
---|
| 22 | + | (1) the total number of semester credit hours or the |
---|
| 23 | + | equivalent for which undergraduate students transferring to the |
---|
| 24 | + | institution applied for transfer credit; and |
---|
| 25 | + | (2) the percentage of the semester credit hours or the |
---|
| 26 | + | equivalent described by Subdivision (1) for which students received |
---|
| 27 | + | transfer credit. |
---|
| 28 | + | (c) The coordinating board, in consultation with general |
---|
| 29 | + | academic teaching institutions to which Subsection (b) applies, |
---|
| 30 | + | shall develop a model transferability report card for use under |
---|
| 31 | + | Subsection (b). |
---|
| 32 | + | (d) Not later than April 1 of each year, the coordinating |
---|
| 33 | + | board shall post on the coordinating board's Internet website a |
---|
| 34 | + | list stating the transferability percentage described by |
---|
| 35 | + | Subsection (b)(2) of each general academic teaching institution |
---|
| 36 | + | other than a public state college. |
---|
| 37 | + | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
71 | | - | develop the model transferability report cards required under |
---|
72 | | - | Sections 51.4033(d) and 51.4034(d), Education Code, as added by |
---|
73 | | - | this Act. |
---|
74 | | - | SECTION 4. (a) Not later than August 1, 2023: |
---|
75 | | - | (1) each general academic teaching institution shall |
---|
76 | | - | post on the institution's Internet website the initial |
---|
77 | | - | transferability report card required under Section 51.4033(c), |
---|
78 | | - | Education Code, as added by this Act; and |
---|
79 | | - | (2) each public junior college shall post on the |
---|
80 | | - | college's Internet website the initial transferability report card |
---|
81 | | - | required under Section 51.4034(c), Education Code, as added by this |
---|
82 | | - | Act. |
---|
83 | | - | (b) Not later than September 1, 2023, the Texas Higher |
---|
84 | | - | Education Coordinating Board shall post on the board's Internet |
---|
85 | | - | website the initial transferability report cards as required under |
---|
86 | | - | Sections 51.4033(d) and 51.4034(d), Education Code, as added by |
---|
87 | | - | this Act. |
---|
88 | | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
| 39 | + | develop the model transferability report card required under |
---|
| 40 | + | Section 51.96854(c), Education Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
| 41 | + | SECTION 3. (a) Not later than March 1, 2023, each public |
---|
| 42 | + | institution of higher education to which Section 51.96854(b), |
---|
| 43 | + | Education Code, as added by this Act, applies shall post on the |
---|
| 44 | + | institution's Internet website the initial transferability report |
---|
| 45 | + | card required under that subsection. |
---|
| 46 | + | (b) Not later than April 1, 2023, the Texas Higher Education |
---|
| 47 | + | Coordinating Board shall post on the board's Internet website the |
---|
| 48 | + | initial list required under Section 51.96854(d), Education Code, as |
---|
| 49 | + | added by this Act. |
---|
| 50 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|