Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021