LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1984
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1984
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1984
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 15, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 13, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 29, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 30, 2021
Analysis
May 21, 2021
Analysis
May 7, 2021
Analysis
May 3, 2021
Comm Sub
Bill
May 22, 2021
Compare
Bill
May 10, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2021