Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 9, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021