Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2021