Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2026 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021