Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021