Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021