Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021