Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2124 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 2124


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a health benefit plan sponsor to
 consent to electronic delivery of certain communications on behalf
 of a party enrolled in the plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 35.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (4-a) to read as follows:
 (4-a)  "Plan sponsor" means a person, other than a
 regulated entity, who establishes, adopts, or maintains a health
 benefit plan, including a vision or dental benefit plan, that
 covers residents of this state, including a plan established,
 adopted, or maintained by an employer or jointly by an employer and
 one or more employee organizations, an association, a committee, a
 joint board of trustees, or any similar group of representatives
 who establish, adopt, or maintain a plan.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 35, Insurance Code, is amended by adding
 Section 35.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.0041.  CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC DELIVERY BY PLAN
 SPONSOR. (a) The plan sponsor of a health benefit plan, including
 a vision or dental benefit plan, may, on behalf of a party enrolled
 in the plan, give the consent required by Section 35.004(c)(1).
 (b)  Before consenting on behalf of a party, a plan sponsor
 must:
 (1)  provide the party with the statements required by
 Sections 35.004(c)(2) and (c)(3)(A);
 (2)  confirm that the party routinely uses electronic
 communications during the normal course of employment; and
 (3)  provide the party an opportunity to opt out of
 delivery by electronic means.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 on or after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2124 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2124 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor