Senate | 05/10/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |