Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021