Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021