Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2183 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021