Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2021