House | 05/11/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |