Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 9, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021