|
05/30/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
05/30/2021
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
|
05/19/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#1090
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 4586
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|