Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021