Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2233 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2021

                    By: Menéndez, et al. S.B. No. 2233
 (In the Senate - Filed April 27, 2021; April 27, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 3, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 3, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2233 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the completion of sexual harassment prevention training
 and ethics training to register as a lobbyist.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 305.005(f), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  The registration must be written and verified and must
 contain:
 (1)  the registrant's full name and address;
 (2)  the registrant's normal business, business phone
 number, and business address;
 (3)  the full name and address of each person:
 (A)  who reimburses, retains, or employs the
 registrant to communicate directly with a member of the legislative
 or executive branch to influence legislation or administrative
 action; and
 (B)  on whose behalf the registrant has
 communicated directly with a member of the legislative or executive
 branch to influence legislation or administrative action;
 (4)  the subject matter of the legislation or of the
 administrative action that is the subject of the registrant's
 direct communication with a member of the legislative or executive
 branch and, if applicable, the docket number or other
 administrative designation of the administrative action;
 (5)  for each person employed or retained by the
 registrant for the purpose of assisting in direct communication
 with a member of the legislative or executive branch to influence
 legislation or administrative action:
 (A)  the full name, business address, and
 occupation of the person; and
 (B)  the subject matter of the legislation or of
 the administrative action to which the person's activities
 reportable under this section were related and, if applicable, the
 docket number or other administrative designation of the
 administrative action; [and]
 (6)  the amount of compensation or reimbursement paid
 by each person who reimburses, retains, or employs the registrant
 for the purpose of communicating directly with a member of the
 legislative or executive branch or on whose behalf the registrant
 communicates directly with a member of the legislative or executive
 branch;
 (7)  a certificate evidencing completion of a sexual
 harassment prevention training course in the previous two years, as
 required by Section 305.0052; and
 (8)  a certificate evidencing completion of an ethics
 training course in the previous two years, as required by Section
 305.0053.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 305, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 305.0052 and 305.0053 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 305.0052.  SEXUAL HARASSMENT PREVENTION TRAINING. (a)
 Each individual required to register under this chapter shall
 attend a sexual harassment prevention training course every two
 years, as approved by the commission, and shall submit to the
 commission a certificate of completion of the course.
 (b)  The certificate of completion must be in a form approved
 by the commission.
 (c)  The commission shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 Sec. 305.0053.  ETHICS TRAINING. (a) Each individual
 required to register under this chapter shall attend an ethics
 training course every two years, as approved by the commission, and
 shall submit to the commission a certificate of completion of the
 course.
 (b)  The certificate of completion must be in a form approved
 by the commission.
 (c)  The commission shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas Ethics
 Commission shall adopt rules as required by Sections 305.0052 and
 305.0053, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 305.005, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a registration required to be filed under
 that section on or after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *