Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2237 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021